HI HB1434 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - (S) Act 160, 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - (S) Act 160, 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a single violation of the prevailing wage law refers to each separate project where the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations finds a contractor in violation of chapter 104, HRS. (SD1)
Title
Public Work Projects; Hours and Wages; Violations
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | (S) Act 160, 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263). | |
2011-06-23 | (H) Act 160, on 6/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 701). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Deferred one day 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 692). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 9:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 9:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Cullen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1209) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Solomon. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cabanilla voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi, Fontaine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |