HI HB1435 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii state giving campaign as the only authorized solicitation of employees in the state workplace on behalf of charitable organizations. Appropriates funds to implement the campaign. (HB1435 HD1)
Title
Hawaii State Giving Campaign; Workplace Giving; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Bertram, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-09 8:15 AM in conference room 329. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-05-2009. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-02-09 8:15am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HUS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |