HI HB1453 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes student-teacher ratios, incorporates the Advancement via Individual Determination program into Department of Education curriculum, requires specified information on the Department of Education's website, and establishes student performance standards. Appropriates funds. (HB1453 HD1)
Title
Education; Reform; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |