HI HB1462 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1462
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts housing projects where at least a portion of the units are set aside for persons and families with incomes at or below one hundred forty per cent of the area median income from county, highway, and school impact fees.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-16-17 10:05AM in conference room 423. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-14-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB579 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1462 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1462 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1462&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1462_.HTM |