HI HB1468 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that planned community associations may not prohibit members from displaying the United States or Hawaii flag. Permits reasonable time, place, and manner restrictions on flag displays but prohibits assessment of a fee to approve the display.
Title
Planned Community Associations; Flag
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Corinne W.L. Ching [R] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] |
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1468 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1468_.HTM |