HI HB1468 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the special operations K9 unit special fund. Appropriates money to the fund for deputy canines and full-time equivalent (FTE) permanent canine handler positions within the department of public safety.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1293 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to PBS/JUD, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35
HB1468 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1468 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1468&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1468_.HTM |