HI HB1505 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires direct payment of child support to an adult child who is presently enrolled in or has been accepted into, a post-high school university, college, or vocational school as a full-time student. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1505 HD1)
Title
Child Support; Adult Child; College
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Oshiro, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Morikawa; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-28-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2022 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.