HI HB1509 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that operating a motor vehicle in the State while using a mobile device is deemed a traffic infraction. Specifies that the penalty for such an infraction shall be a fine of $200, or $400 if in a school zone or construction area. Specifies that if a person is under the age of eighteen years old at the time of a second offense, the fine shall be $300, and $400 for the third and subsequent offenses committed while under the age of eighteen years old. Requires collected fines to be deposited in the state highway fund. (SD2)
Title
Highway Safety; Use of Mobile Electronic Devices
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Yamashita, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 519) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3335) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-01-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2994) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TIA, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 216). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Evans, Fale, Jordan, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Oshiro voting no (3) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 2:00PM. |
2014-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday, 02-18-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-14. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-07-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2708 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to TIA, JDL.