HI HB1523 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Overrides the rulemaking authority of the procurement policy office for administrative rules adopted since 1/1/03. Reinstates the office's rulemaking authority on 1/1/11.
Title
Procurement Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-12-09 7:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EBM, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1523&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1523_.HTM |