HI HB1524 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - (S) Act 125, 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - (S) Act 125, 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires those sentenced for agricultural theft to provide restitution to the victim. Requires proof of identification from sellers of agricultural commodities. Establishes criminal penalties for failure to maintain a certificate of ownership or other written proof of ownership of agricultural commodities. Makes theft of agricultural commodities an offense of theft in the second degree and establishes lack of ownership or movement certificates as prima facie evidence of the theft. (SD2)
Title
Agricultural Commodities; Criminal Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | (S) Act 125, 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). | |
2012-06-15 | (H) Act 125, on 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 666). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Marumoto, Nishimoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 649). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 642). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 758). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Shimabukuro, Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Awana, Hashem, Riviere. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3322) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-14-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Re-Referred to AGL, JDL. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-11 2:30PM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-02-11 9:40AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |