HI HB1543 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 075, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 075, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds. Makes findings required by Article VII, section 13 of the State Constitution to declare that issuance of authorized bonds will not cause the debt limit to be exceeded. (HB1543 CD1)
Title
State Bonds ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Act 075, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). |
2016-06-21 | House | Act 075, on 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-16 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2016-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 64). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2016-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |