HI HB1552 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Transit-Oriented Redevelopment Community Districts within the Hawaii Community Development Authority (HCDA) to develop districts along certain rail stations in the Honolulu rail station transit corridor. Allows the HCDA to enter into public-private partnerships for a lease-back arrangement of lands. Provides general obligation bond financing for infrastructure improvements in Transit-Oriented Redevelopment Community Districts.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1552 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1552&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1552_.HTM |