HI HB1564 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide firefighting helicopter program, to be administered by the State Fire Marshal. Appropriates funds to obtain helicopters, facilities equipment, and supplies; hire and train staff; and do other things necessary to ensure that the program is ready to begin providing aerial firefighting services on July 1, 2025. Declares that the expenditure exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Establishes that this measure only takes effect if another bill is passed that establishes a State Fire Marshal position.
Title
Relating To Statewide Fire Helicopters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2808 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
Fire Marshal
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Statewide Firefighting Helicopter Program
Fire Marshal
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Statewide Firefighting Helicopter Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1564&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1564_.HTM |