HI HB1573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Caps the primary and secondary ticket seller service charges that may be added on to event ticket prices. Requires website operators to guarantee refunds in certain circumstances and disclose that the website is not the primary ticket seller. Prohibits speculative tickets and the usage of bots.
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1573&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1573_.HTM |