HI HB1579 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Act 019, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Act 019, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that money judgments are considered valid liens against all real property, including registered property, when recorded in the bureau of conveyances.
Title
Judgment Liens; Money Judgments
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Act 019, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2014-04-16 | House | Act 019, on 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2014-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 492). |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3261) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2853) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-03-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-10 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1579&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1579_.HTM |