HI HB1581 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii community development authority to collaborate with and consider the recommendations of the working group of interested stakeholders in developing, accepting, and implementing plans for the development of Kakaako makai.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako Makai
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1069 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - (S) Act 149, 6/21/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1581&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1581_.HTM |