HI HB1585 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 142, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a rebate program for installation of eligible new or upgraded multi-user electric vehicle charging systems. Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to contract for third-party administration of the rebate program. Appropriates funds. (HB1585 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Environment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 142, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
2019-07-01HouseAct 142, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Aquino, Takumi, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 4:36PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 4:36PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Inouye, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Aquino, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 882) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET/TRS, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 330).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback