HI HB1590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) or Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC), regardless of the means of purchase and the SNAP or WIC eligibility of the purchaser. Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of nonprescription drugs. Effective 1/1/2023.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Exemption
General Excise Tax
Groceries
Nonprescription Drugs
Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
General Excise Tax
Groceries
Nonprescription Drugs
Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1590&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1590_.HTM |