HI HB1596 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Chun, Garrett, Takenouchi, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Chun, Garrett, Takenouchi, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the class B felony offense of delivering drug paraphernalia to persons under eighteen years of age applicable to offenders who are at least twenty-one years old. Exempts drug paraphernalia for marijuana from certain penalties under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act. Makes the possession of less than one ounce of recreational marijuana a nonjailable violation punishable by a fine of $25. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Controlled Substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Chun, Garrett, Takenouchi, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |