HI HB1616 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one advanced life support ambulance to be based in Puna on the island of Hawaii and to be used from 8:00 a.m. to 10:00 p.m., and to include a vehicle, equipment, and personnel costs. (HB1616 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, C. Lee, McDermott, Say, Souki, Ward excused (6). |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-24 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-01-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 01-24-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |