HI HB1632 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies the notaries public revolving fund, and criminal forfeiture revolving fund as special funds; litigation deposits trust fund as a trust account; and the national mortgage settlement trust account as a trust fund. Abolishes the criminal justice commission trust account. Abolishes the UH intercollegiate athletics special fund. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 288). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:30PM in conference room 308. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-11 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2020-01-29 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |