HI HB1637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Act 010, 08/06/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Act 010, 08/06/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the spending ceiling for moneys in the civil monetary penalty special fund for use by the Department of Health for Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services-approved compliance activities. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Senate | Act 010, 08/06/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2020-08-06 | House | Act 010, on 08/06/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 07-02-20 10:10AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 126). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |