HI HB1654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Act 006, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Act 006, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the office of community services special fund of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations and transfers unencumbered balance to the general fund.
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Act 006, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2018-04-24 | House | Act 006, on 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106). |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 576). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3672) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2983) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 50). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 827-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1654&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1654_.HTM |