HI HB1683 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an employee to use leave under the Hawaii Family Leave Law to care for a sibling. Effective 7/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Family Leave
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Aquino, Tupola. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 523) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3583) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3054) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 74). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 353-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, San Buenaventura. |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |