HI HB1686 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Tam.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Tam.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the authorized insurance benefits for chiropractic treatments for personal injury protection benefits under motor vehicle insurance be tied to the charges, and any subsequent increases in charges, that are permissible under the workers' compensation supplemental medical fee schedule. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Tam. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 5:25PM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 3:14PM in conference room 224. |
2024-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-24 10:25AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 775). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Aquino, Fevella. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Garrett, Tam, Alcos. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3751) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Hashem, Tam. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |