HI HB17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB17
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to acquire by eminent domain the seawall and the real property underneath the seawall that is located on or near the seaward boundaries of property between 2943 Kalakaua Avenue and 3019 Kalakaua Avenue. Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources for the just compensation of taking, and the repair and maintenance of the entire seawall and the real property under the seawall.
Title
Relating To Eminent Domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB17 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB17 (Carry Over) 2019-01-25 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=17&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB17_.HTM |