HI HB1702 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any person to file for a contested case hearing to determine jurisdiction over a public road and establishes the determination process.
Title
Public Roads; Jurisdictional Dispute; Resolution Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-04-09 8:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1702&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1702_.HTM |