HI HB1702 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires medical cannabis dispensaries to be closed on official state and federal holidays. Prohibits the transportation of cannabis to another county or island for testing except when there is no certified laboratory located in same county or island as the dispensary. Prohibits dispensaries from being located within 750 feet of a public housing project or complex. Repeals statute allowing for the sale or transfer of dispensary licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-15HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback