HI HB1769 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the management of albizia trees along tsunami evacuation routes on Hawaii Island. Directs the Department to work with the state Department of Defense to secure additional resources. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1769 HD1)
Title
Invasive Species; Appropriation; Albizia ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-24-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |