HI HB1780 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the purpose of funding construction costs of a water storage and distribution system on agricultural lands owned by the Office of Hawaiian Affairs in Wahiawa, Oahu surrounding the Kukaniloko Birthing Stones site. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To A Water Storage And Distribution System For Certain Agricultural Land In Wahiawa, Oahu.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2191 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).