HI HB1799 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of education to offer optional asthma self-management instruction to students. Requires the department of education to provide mandatory asthma training to teachers and other department employees who interact with students. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Asthma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2822 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 147, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).