HI HB18 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits operation of a motor vehicle when an LCD panel or video monitor is located forward of the back of the driver's seat. Sets forth exceptions, including vehicle operation, observation, or navigation.
Title
Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=18&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB18_.HTM |