HI HB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:21PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals statutory limitations on the time period in which a survivor of childhood sexual abuse may file suit. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Childhood Sexual Abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:21PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:45PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Belatti, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 691) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1965) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateRe-Referred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 136).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-16HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback