HI HB1801 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds. Makes findings required by Article VII, Section 13, of the Hawaii State Constitution to declare that the issuance of authorized bonds will not cause the debt limit to be exceeded. Effective 7/1/2050.
Title
Relating To State Bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-25 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 783). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Lee added as Conferee. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Chair. Senator Moriwaki discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Chair. |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 513). |
2024-04-02 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, San Buenaventura). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-24. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 222). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson excused (5). |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 739-24), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward. |
2024-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |