HI HB1837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to create emergency access plans for each Department school. Requires each Department school to have a comprehensive school evacuation communication plan for use during emergencies. Requires the Department of Education to collaborate with the Department of Transportation to assess all Department school campuses to determine if there are sufficient emergency evacuation routes for each campus and report to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To School Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Elefante, Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from EDN/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EDN/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Comprehensive School Evacuation Communication Plans
DOE
DOT
Emergency Action Plans
Evacuation Routes
Expenditure Ceiling
Comprehensive School Evacuation Communication Plans
DOE
DOT
Emergency Action Plans
Evacuation Routes
Expenditure Ceiling