HI HB1849 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) extension agent position for the Hawaii Ant Lab West Hawaii Office. Effective July 1, 2150. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Invasive Species.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2737 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback