HI HB1852 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Emergency Services Department of the City and County of Honolulu to expand Community Outreach Response and Engagement Program services outside of urban Honolulu. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Emergency Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 507-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-14-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2222 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.