HI HB1858 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person who intentionally or knowingly causes bodily injury to a liquor commission investigator engaged in the performance of duty commits the offense of assault in the second degree.
Title
Penal Code; Assault; Liquor Commission Investigators
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2934) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Oshiro voting no (2) and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley, McDermott. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1858&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1858_.HTM |