HI HB188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state employees from taking any official action directly affecting a business or other undertaking in which a parent, sibling, or emancipated child has a substantial financial interest. (HB188 HD1)
Title
Ethics Commission Package; Conflicts of Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Evans, Saiki, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB451 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.