HI HB1884 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:45PM; CR 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:45PM; CR 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies disclosures required from members of the Legislature. Takes effect 4/14/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Standards Of Conduct.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:45PM; CR 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 5:00PM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Ganaden, Miyake, Takayama, Souza. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 691). |
2024-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 485) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye, Keohokalole, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Shimabukuro . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Elefante, Awa. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-22-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-19-24 10:00AM; CR 016. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 248). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2218 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - Referred to JDC.