HI HB1905 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DLNR to issue Hawaii hunting apprentice permits authorizing persons without a hunting license to hunt under direct supervision of a licensed hunter and with certain additional restrictions for persons ten years old and younger. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB1905 HD1)
Title
DLNR; Hawaii Hunting Apprentice Permit; Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 01-29-14 9:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |