HI HB1905 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds specific requirements to Hawaii's existing sexuality health education law. Requires the BOE and DOE to collaborate to provide curricula information to the public. Requires students to be excused from the provided instruction upon written request by a parent or guardian.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 01-25-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1905&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1905_.HTM |