HI HB1922 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transferors of real property located in Hawaii to furnish a tax clearance to the Bureau of Conveyances before recording the transfer. Authorizes the Director of Taxation to require escrow depositories required to file a return of the tax withheld on a real property transfer to remit taxes by electronic funds transfer. Requires an escrow depository filing a return on behalf of a transferee to file not more than two working days following the authorization date and deliver a receipt to the transferee, subject to a $100-per-day late fee. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1922 HD1)
Title
Disposition of Real Property; Tax Clearance
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 65). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-10 4:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to Friday, 02-12-10, 4:00 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-10-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-14 | (H) Pending introduction. |