HI HB1923 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes overnight camps in operation prior to January 1, 1961, to be regulated via the special permit process. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 538) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3724) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-20-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 258). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-29-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Takayama. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/AGR on Wednesday, 02-14-24 11:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 10:35AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/AGR on Friday, 02-09-24 10:35AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2756 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - The recommendation was not adopted.