HI HB1955 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of special land and development fund moneys to eradicate or mitigate invasive species and install and maintain safety improvements on improved lands that provide lease revenue to the Department of Land and Natural Resources and that have significant cultural or historic value. Appropriates moneys out of the special land and development fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Special Land And Development Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2755 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Authorized Uses
DLNR
Invasive Species
Safety Improvements
Special Land and Development Fund
Authorized Uses
DLNR
Invasive Species
Safety Improvements
Special Land and Development Fund