HI HB1986 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to develop trauma-informed approaches for the Department of Education. Task force to cease 7/1/2021. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Trauma-informed Approaches.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from HSH/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Ward. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSH/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |