HI HB1996 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the completion of the Maui Food Innovation Center at the University of Hawaii Maui College. Effective 7/1/2525. (SD1)
Title
Maui Food Innovation Center; University of Hawaii Maui College; General Obligation Bonds ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kahele, Kidani, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Choy, McKelvey, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3302) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2870) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 156). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from HED/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Evans, Har. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Ohno, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED/CPC on Thursday, 01-30-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HED/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2077 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to HED/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28