HI HB2014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to identify available state land for the establishment of a homelessness village. Establishes the Puuhonua Homeless Villages program. Requires the Department of Human Services, in conjunction with the Governor, to hold a public meeting prior to the establishment of a homeless village. Requires the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Governor, to report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 670). |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Keohokalole added as Conferee. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; K. Rhoads, Taniguchi, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Yamashita added as Conferee. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Brower, Nishimoto, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Nakamura, Ward. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS/HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 642) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3439) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Wakai. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/HSG on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Public Meeting ($)
Puuhonua Homeless Villages Program
Report
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Public Meeting ($)
Puuhonua Homeless Villages Program
Report