HI HB2023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for certain transit-oriented development projects identified in the state Strategic Plan for Transit-Oriented Development. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3357) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 175). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Friday, 02-11-22 11:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2154 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
General Obligation Bonds
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Transit-Oriented Development
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
General Obligation Bonds
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Transit-Oriented Development