HI HB2024 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a detailed process allowing law enforcement officers and family or household members to obtain a court order to prevent a person from accessing firearms and ammunition where the person poses a danger of causing bodily injury to oneself or another.
Title
Relating To Gun Violence Protective Orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2024&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2024_.HTM |